Carter v. Vance et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Carter
Defendant: Sharon Vance, Brett/Robinson Gulf Corporation, Sharon K. Vance and Phoenix V Association, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00351
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Filing Rogs & RFP filed by Sharon K. Vance, Sharon Vance. (Cash, Regina)
August 6, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Sharon K. Vance, Sharon Vance. (Cash, Regina)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/21/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 8/5/20. (cmj)
August 5, 2020 Filing 15 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #11 filed by Brett/Robinson Gulf Corporation, Corporate Disclosure Statement #13 filed by Phoenix V Association, Inc. (Milling, Bert)
August 5, 2020 Filing 14 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #13 filed by Phoenix V Association, Inc. (Steele, William)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Phoenix V Association, Inc.. (Thrasher, Hannah)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Phoenix V Association, Inc.. (Thrasher, Hannah)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Brett/Robinson Gulf Corporation, Brett/Robinson Gulf Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Brett/Robinson Gulf Corporation for Brett/Robinson Gulf Corporation.. (Smith, Ernest)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Brett/Robinson Gulf Corporation. (Smith, Ernest)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ernest Glenn Smith, Jr on behalf of Brett/Robinson Gulf Corporation (Smith, Ernest)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Carter. Sharon K. Vance served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt) (Douglas, Gayle)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Carter. Sharon Vance served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt) (Douglas, Gayle)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Carter. Brett/Robinson Gulf Corporation served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt) (Douglas, Gayle)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Carter. Phoenix V Association, Inc. served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt) (Douglas, Gayle)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Service Order entered 7/9/2020. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 8/24/2020.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 7/8/20. (cmj)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brett/Robinson Gulf Corporation, Phoenix V Association, Inc., Sharon K. Vance, Sharon Vance. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Ryan Carter (Douglas, Gayle)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2640408, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Ryan Carter. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/6/2020. (Douglas, Gayle) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Vance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Vance
Represented By: Regina Ford Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett/Robinson Gulf Corporation
Represented By: Ernest Glenn Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon K. Vance
Represented By: Regina Ford Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix V Association, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah Mebane Thrasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Carter
Represented By: Gayle LaRece Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?