Marocchini v. Robert C. Brown, M.D., P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Robin Marocchini
Defendant: Robert C. Brown and Robert C. Brown, M.D., P.C. doing business as Brown, Pearson & Guepet Gynecology and Urogynecology
Case Number: 1:2020cv00356
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #20 Disclosure Statement filed by Robert C. Brown, M.D., P.C. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/10/2020. (ctn)
September 8, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Robert C. Brown, Robert C. Brown, M.D., P.C.. (Lee, Mark)
September 8, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Robert C. Brown, Robert C. Brown, M.D., P.C.. (Lee, Mark)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Robert C. Brown, M.D., P.C. is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (required of "nongovernmental corporate" parties) and S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (required of "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Tues. 9/8/2020 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/1/2020. (ctn)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER finding as moot #13 Motion to Strike answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/1/20. (srr)
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED ANSWER to by Robert C. Brown, Robert C. Brown, M.D., P.C.. (Lee, Mark)
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Robert C. Brown, Robert C. Brown, M.D., P.C.. (Lee, Mark)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT-ONLY ORDER Setting Motion Deadlines re: #13 MOTION to Strike #11 Answer to Complaint filed by Robin Marocchini. Defendants' brief in response to said motion, if any, must be filed and served no later than Tues. 9/1/2020. Plaintiff's brief in reply to the response, if any, must be filed and served no later than Wed. 9/9/2020. Motion to be taken under submission on Thurs. 9/10/2020. Once the motion is under submission, no further submissions related to the issues raised may be filed unless (1) the submission is in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(f)(3), or (2) the proponent obtains leave of court for good cause shown. Should the Court determine that oral argument would be beneficial, a hearing will be set by separate order. Otherwise, this motion is being submitted without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). "Oral argument requests must contain specific reasons why oral argument would be helpful." S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/13/2020. (ctn)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike #11 Answer to Complaint filed by Robin Marocchini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer) (Braswell, Kasie)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/12/20. (Attachments: #1 consent) (srr)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Robert C. Brown, Robert C. Brown, M.D., P.C.. (Lee, Mark)
August 7, 2020 Answer due from Robert C. Brown on 8/14/2020; and Robert C. Brown, M.D., P.C. on 8/14/2020. (srd)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT-ONLY ORDER re: #7 NOTICE by Robin Marocchini Issuing Subpoena to Verizon. The Plaintiff's subpoena dated 8/3/2020 issued to Verizon is QUASHED sua sponte as premature. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1) ("A party may not seek discovery from any source before the parties have conferred as required by Rule 26(f), except in a proceeding exempted from initial disclosure under Rule 26(a)(1)(B), or when authorized by these rules, by stipulation, or by court order."); Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(d)(1) ("A party or attorney responsible for issuing and serving a subpoena must take reasonable steps to avoid imposing undue burden or expense on a person subject to the subpoena. The court for the district where compliance is required must enforce this duty..."). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/3/2020. (ctn)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint; Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production served on Robert C. Brown, MD, P.C., d/b/a Brown, Pearson & Guepet Gynecology and Urogynecology on 07/24/2020, filed by Robin Marocchini. (Braswell, Kasie)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint; Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production served on Robert C. Brown, MD on 07/24/2020, filed by Robin Marocchini. (Braswell, Kasie)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Robin Marocchini Issuing Subpoena to Verizon (Braswell, Kasie)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Robin Marocchini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Robert C. Brown, #3 Summons to Robert C. Brown, MD, P.C., d/b/a Brown, Pearson & Guepet Gynecology and Urogynecology) (Braswell, Kasie)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order that plaintiff is to file and serve by 7/23/2020 an amended complaint that corrects the deficiencies as set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/16/20. (srr) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/17/2020) (srr).
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Service NOTICE entered 7/16/2020. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service deadline set to 8/31/2020. (srr)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Robert C. Brown, Robert C. Brown, M.D., P.C.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srr)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 request for reassignment) (srr)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2643604, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Robin Marocchini. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Robert C. Brown, #3 Summons - Robert C. Brown, MD, P.C., d/b/a Brown, Pearson & Guepet Gynecology and Urogynecology) (Braswell, Kasie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marocchini v. Robert C. Brown, M.D., P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Marocchini
Represented By: Kasie M. Braswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. Brown
Represented By: Mark W. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. Brown, M.D., P.C. doing business as Brown, Pearson & Guepet Gynecology and Urogynecology
Represented By: Mark W. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?