Harris v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Johnnie Harris
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00361
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: William E Cassady
2 Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys for Defendants filed by Wesley B. Gilchrist and Amber Nicole Hall. Attorneys Wesley B. Gilchrist and Amber Nicole Hall terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/3/20. (lto)
September 3, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION for Wesley B. Gilchrist and Amber N. Hall to Withdraw as Attorney. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj)
September 2, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Wesley B. Gilchrist and Amber N. Hall to Withdraw as Attorney filed by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Hall, Amber)
September 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Randall Little on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Little, Jonathan)
September 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Keith Essig on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Essig, Brandon)
July 27, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan I. Prater, IV on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Prater, Harlan)
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley B. Gilchrist on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Gilchrist, Wesley)
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Nicole Hall on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Hall, Amber)
July 27, 2020 Notice of Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Anthony Aloneftis. Pursuant to the Case Management Order entered in 19-cv-5000-KD-MU-C only the pro hac vice fee is being paid. I certify that documentation has been previously filed in 1:20-cv-00161. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2650397, Online Credit Card Payment.) (Aloneftis, Anthony)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/4/2019. (skb)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order, # 2 HIPAA Protective Order, # 3 Authorization) (skb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00727. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 7/17/2020. (NEF: Section J) (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(lag) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Johnnie Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Election Not to Mediate)(Nelson, Nathan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8186359) filed by Johnnie Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Election Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Nathan Lee Nelson added to party Johnnie Harris(pty:pla).(Nelson, Nathan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc
Represented By: Brandon Keith Essig
Represented By: Harlan I. Prater, IV
Represented By: Amber Nicole Hall
Represented By: Jonathan Randall Little
Represented By: Wesley B. Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Brandon Keith Essig
Represented By: Harlan I. Prater, IV
Represented By: Amber Nicole Hall
Represented By: Jonathan Randall Little
Represented By: Wesley B. Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Harris
Represented By: Nathan Lee Nelson
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Aloneftis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?