McQueen v. Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Marcus D. McQueen
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2020cv00362
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to prosecute & failure to comply w/the Court's directives as set out. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/14/20. (skb) (Copy to Plaintiff)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order, Plf is to complete & file, by 8/24/2020, this Court's forms for a complaint under 42 U.S.C. 1983 & a motion to proceed without prepayment of fees or, in lieu thereof, pay the $400.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/23/2020. (copy to Plf w/forms on 7/23/2020) (tot)
July 21, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson(PSU). (tot)
July 21, 2020 REFERRAL OF #5 Case Transferred In (District Transfer) to Judge Nelson(PSU). (tot)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:20-cv-00386. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 17, 2020 Case transferred to Southern District of Alabama. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (no pdf attached to this entry)( (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/17/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED that The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED, and this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 7/14/2020. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/17/2020.]
July 9, 2020 No objections filed to the #3 Recommendation. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/17/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama pursuant to under 28 USC 1404(a); Objections to R&R due by 7/2/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/18/2020. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/17/2020.]
June 8, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Marcus D. McQueen. (No PDF document attached - see docket entry #1 ).(hrs, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/17/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Marcus D. McQueen. (hrs, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/11/2020) (wcl, ). Modified on 6/11/2020 - due to a clerical error, the pdf for 20cv389 was attached as has been replaced with the correct application (wcl, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/17/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Department of Corrections, filed by Marcus D. McQueen.(hrs, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/11/2020) (wcl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2020: #1 Attachment) (wcl, ). Modified on 6/11/2020 - due to a clerical error, the pdf for 20cv389 was attached as has been replaced with the correct complaint and attachment letter (wcl, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McQueen v. Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus D. McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?