Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC v. Goodman et al
Plaintiff: Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC
Defendant: ManhattanLife Assurance Company of America, Stewart Goodman and Ads for Academics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00369
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Defendant Stewart Goodman's #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant's Answer or other responsive pleading is due no later than October 23, 2020. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/9/2020. (mab)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, GRANTING #7 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Nicole Marie Strickler. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/9/2020. (mab)
September 8, 2020 REFERRAL OF #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint to Judge Moorer. (tot)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Stewart Goodman. (Strickler, Nicole)
September 3, 2020 REFERRAL OF #7 MOTION and APPLICATION for Nicole M. Strickler to Appear Pro Hac Vice to Judge Moorer. (tot)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION and APPLICATION for Nicole M. Strickler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2671843, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Ads for Academics, Inc., Stewart Goodman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Strickler, Nicole)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC. Ads for Academics, Inc. waiver sent on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (Carroll, Matthew)
August 14, 2020 Answer due from Stewart Goodman pursuant to FRCP 12(a) - See Doc. #5 . (tot)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Goodman, Stewart on 8/10/2020, filed by Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC. (Carroll, Matthew)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC. ManhattanLife Assurance Company of America waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Carroll, Matthew)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Ads for Academics, Inc., Stewart Goodman, ManhattanLife Assurance Company of America. (Note to Counsel: The Summonses have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC (Carroll, Matthew)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2649086, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Carroll, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC v. Goodman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ManhattanLife Assurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Goodman
Represented By: Nicole Strickler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ads for Academics, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Strickler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Carroll
Represented By: James H. McFerrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?