Crawford v. Gulf Coast Motor Sales, Inc.
Plaintiff: James Crawford
Defendant: Gulf Coast Motor Sales, Inc. and Gulf Coast Motor Sales, Inc. registered as Palmer's Airport Toyota, Inc., d/b/a Palmer's Toyota Superstore
Case Number: 1:2020cv00376
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
2 Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by James Crawford of Service Attempt (Jackson, Jody)
September 14, 2020 REFERRAL OF #5 Notice of Service Attempt to Judge Bivins. (srd)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (clr)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Gulf Coast Motor Sales, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by James Crawford of Consent to Join FLSA Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Crawford Opt-In Form, #2 Exhibit White - Opt-In form, #3 Exhibit Dorch - Opt-In Form) (Jackson, Jody)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gulf Coast Motor Sales, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2651809, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by James Crawford. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons) (Jackson, Jody)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. Gulf Coast Motor Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast Motor Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast Motor Sales, Inc. registered as Palmer's Airport Toyota, Inc., d/b/a Palmer's Toyota Superstore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Crawford
Represented By: Jody Forester Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?