O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. v. University of South Alabama
Plaintiff: O'Reilly Automotive, Inc.
Defendant: University of South Alabama
Case Number: 1:2020cv00395
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Callie V S Granade
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION to Dismiss :( Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2020 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady.). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/23/20. (Cassady, William)
September 10, 2020 REFERRAL OF #9 Reply to #8 Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss to Judge Cassady. (mab)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion #6 filed by University of South Alabama. (Boller, Thomas)
September 3, 2020 REFERRAL OF #8 Response in Opposition to #6 Motion to Dismiss to Judge Cassady. (mab)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by O'Reilly Automotive, Inc.. (Latta, Forrest)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER taking under advisement #6 Motion to Dismiss. A response to the motion to dismiss is due not later than September 3, 2020. Any reply to the response shall be filed not later than September 9, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/19/20. (Cassady, William)
August 19, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (mab)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by University of South Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Boller, Thomas)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by O'Reilly Automotive, Inc.. University of South Alabama served on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020 (Latta, Forrest)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 Service Notice entered 8/10/2020. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 9/21/2020. (tot)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to University of South Alabama. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. (Latta, Forrest)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against University of South Alabama ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2657586, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by O'Reilly Automotive, Inc.. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 11/5/2020. (Latta, Forrest) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. v. University of South Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of South Alabama
Represented By: Thomas R. Boller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O'Reilly Automotive, Inc.
Represented By: Emily C. Killion
Represented By: Forrest S. Latta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?