Virgil Mitchell v. Wise Construction
Plaintiff: Virgil Mitchell
Defendant: Wise Construction
Case Number: 1:2020cv00406
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Callie V S Granade
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Pro Se Litigant Handbook w/completed forms by Virgil Mitchell. (Referred to J/Bivins on 8/26/2020) (tot)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Virgil Mitchell. (Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/26/2020). (tot)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wise Construction filed by Virgil Mitchell. (Referred to MJ/Bivins on 8/26/2020. (tot)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order re: #1 Complaint filed by Virgil Mitchell. Plaintiff is ORDERED to re-file his Complaint using the Court's form and either pay the $400 filing fee or file a motion to proceed without payment of fees by 8/31/2020. Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff the Motion for IFP form, the Court's EEOC Complaint form and Pro Se Litigant Handbook as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 08/17/2020. (srd) Copies to Plaintiff.
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wise Construction, filed by Virgil Mitchell. (srd) Referred to Judge Bivins.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Virgil Mitchell v. Wise Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wise Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?