Alexander v. Small
Plaintiff: Fredrick Dewayne Alexander
Defendant: Jarred Small
Case Number: 1:2020cv00408
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Plaintiff's action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute this action as set out. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/29/20. (skb) (Copy to Plaintiff on 9/29/20)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order directing payment of partial filing fee re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to REMIT $15.00 by 9/11/2020. If filing fee is paid, Clerk is DIRECTED to forward this action as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 08/19/2020. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff.
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Fredrick Dewayne Alexander. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray (PSU). (skb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 1983 COMPLAINT against Jarred Small filed by Fredrick Dewayne Alexander. Referred to MJ/Murray (PSU). (skb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Dewayne Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarred Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?