Gauthier v. Hood et al
Plaintiff: Brian S. Gauthier
Defendant: Deidre Prevo, Travis Paul, Felecia Crawford, George Wilson, Director Hood, Bay Minette Hospital, Manuel Pouparinas and Wexford Health Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00413
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order denying #8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Brian S. Gauthier; denying #9 MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brian S. Gauthier. Plaintiff is given additional time to pay the initial partial filing fee of $21. (Filing Fee due by 10/28/2020.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/30/20. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend Exhibits to Complaint #1 Complaint filed by Brian S. Gauthier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU). (meh)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Reconsider Order re: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brian S. Gauthier. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU). (meh)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Brian S. Gauthier. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU). (meh)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Filing Fee of $21 due by 9/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/1/20. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brian S. Gauthier. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU). (skb)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Motion Motion for Joinder/Designation of Reginald Burrell as Plaintiff's Assistant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 08/21/2020. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff.
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for plaintiff to file correct form IFP no later than 9/21/20. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 9/21/2020.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/21/20. (order and IFP form mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for joinder/designation of Reginald Burrell as plaintiff' assistant filed by Brian S. Gauthier. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (cmj)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brian S. Gauthier. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson/PSU. (cmj)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 1983 COMPLAINT against Bay Minette Hospital, Felecia Crawford, Director Hood, Travis Paul, Manuel Pouparinas, Deidre Prevo, Wexford Health Services, Inc., filed by Brian S. Gauthier; ref to Judge Nelson/PSU (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gauthier v. Hood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deidre Prevo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felecia Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Minette Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Pouparinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian S. Gauthier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?