The Medical Protective Company v. Crafton Chiropractic, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Medical Protective Company
Defendant: Katherine Crafton, Emily Johnson, Doug Johnson and Crafton Chiropractic, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00414
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 Alias Summons Issued as to Katherine Crafton. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by The Medical Protective Company Notice of Proposed Alias Summons (Wall, Jennifer)
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Katherine Crafton. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (nah)
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by The Medical Protective Company Notice of Proposed Alias Summons (Wall, Jennifer)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Medical Protective Company. Doug Johnson served on 10/2/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (Wall, Jennifer) Modified on 10/8/2020 (srd).
October 6, 2020 REFERRAL OF #10 Notice of Steps Taken to Perfect Service to Judge Bivins. (srd)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Steps Taken to Perfect Service (Wall, Jennifer) Modified on 10/6/2020 (srd).
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 09/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (srd)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Emily Johnson. (Bonner, William)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Doug Johnson. (Bonner, William)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Medical Protective Company. Crafton Chiropractic, Inc. served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020 (Wall, Jennifer)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by The Medical Protective Company as to Crafton Chiropractic, Inc.. (Wall, Jennifer)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Medical Protective Company. Emily Johnson served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020 (Wall, Jennifer)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William Earl Bonner on behalf of Doug Johnson, Emily Johnson (Bonner, William)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Katherine Crafton, Crafton Chiropractic, Inc., Doug Johnson, and Emily Johnson. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2663980, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by The Medical Protective Company. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 11/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Summons Crafton Chiro by RA, #7 Summons Crafton Chiro co Katherine Crafton, #8 Summons Katherine Crafton, #9 Summons Doug Johnson, #10 Summons Emily Johnson) (Wall, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Medical Protective Company v. Crafton Chiropractic, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Crafton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Johnson
Represented By: William Earl Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Johnson
Represented By: William Earl Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crafton Chiropractic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Medical Protective Company
Represented By: Stephen E. Whitehead
Represented By: Jennifer W. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?