Buerger v. U.S. Department of Health & Human Services
Plaintiff: STEPHANI S. BUERGER
Defendant: JOSEPH P. ADDABBO, Social Security Administration, Medicare, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services and MEDICAID AGENCY CENTRAL OFFICE
Case Number: 1:2020cv00421
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order referring action to Magistrate Judge for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/27/2020. (copy to Pltf) (mab)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-01528. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Southern District of Alabama. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 8/18/2020. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 07/29/2020. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/25/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, MEDICARE, MEDICAID AGENCY CENTRAL OFFICE, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, JOSEPH P. ADDABBO filed by STEPHANIE BUERGER. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/25/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.ORDERED that the Complaint, ECF No. 1, is DISMISSED without prejudice and with leave to amend within 30 days from the filing date of this order. Plaintiffs failure to file a conforming complaint within the time provided will result in dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/24/2020. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/25/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by STEPHANIE BUERGER (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/25/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by STEPHANIE BUERGER. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2020: #2 Additional Documents to Complaint, #3 Additional Documents to Complaint) (zmd). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/25/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 06/08/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/25/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buerger v. U.S. Department of Health & Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH P. ADDABBO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health & Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAID AGENCY CENTRAL OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANI S. BUERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?