Lucy v. Thames et al
Plaintiff: William N. Lucy
Defendant: Frank Kruse, Gretchen Elaine Walker, Fernandez, Crane & Comb Law Firm, Jimmy H. Fernandez, Gus B. Thames, Jr. in his Personal and Official Capacity doing business as Sixety One St. Francis Street Inc. doing business as Thames Jackson Harris Co. Realty and Mark Erwin
Case Number: 1:2020cv00450
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
2 Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order GRANTING #11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William N. Lucy. Plaintiff shall REMIT to the Clerk within (21) days a money order for $13.33. If filing fee is received, the Clerk is DIRECTED to forward this action for review as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/04/2020. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff.
October 30, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Page 5 by William N. Lucy re #11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as directed in #12 Order. (srd) Referred to Judge Nelson (PSU). (srd)
October 30, 2020 Filing 13 Plaintiff's Motion to Add Defendants filed by William N. Lucy. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU). (srd)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order re: #10 Order and #11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William N. Lucy. Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff page 5 of new IFP as set out. Plaintiff is ORDERED to execute Section VIII and return it to this Court NLT 11/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/23/2020. (srd) Copies to Plaintiff.
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William N. Lucy. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU). (srd)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order re: #1 Complaint and #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by William N. Lucy. Plaintiff is ORDERED by 11/9/2020 to either file a Motion for IFP on the Court's form or pay the $400.00 filing fee as set out. Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff the Court's Motion for IFP form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/9/2020. (srd) Copies to Plaintiff.
September 21, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by William N. Lucy. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU).
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:20-cv-00455. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1) Plf's #6 objection is OVERRULED; 2) The #4 Recommendation is ADOPTED; 3) This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a). Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/10/2020. (bes, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/10/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Case transferred to Southern District of Alabama; ELECTRONICALLY transferred via CM/ECF to Clerk. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/10/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #5 Motion to cease and desist and #5 Motion to Stay. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 7/24/2020. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/10/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by William N. Lucy. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/10/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to cease and desist and MOTION to Stay by William N. Lucy. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/10/2020.]
July 24, 2020 No objections filed to #4 report and recommendation (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/10/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); Objections to R&R due by 7/21/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 7/6/2020. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/10/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing that the above-styled action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 for further proceedings and determination or recommendation as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/6/2020. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/10/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by William N. Lucy. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(amf, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/10/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Erwin, Jimmy H. Fernandez, Fernandez, Crane & Comb Law Firm, Frank Kruse, Gus B. Thames, Jr, Gretchen Elaine Walker, filed by William N. Lucy. (amf, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/10/2020.]
June 30, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by William N. Lucy. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF) (amf, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucy v. Thames et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Elaine Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernandez, Crane & Comb Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy H. Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gus B. Thames, Jr. in his Personal and Official Capacity doing business as Sixety One St. Francis Street Inc. doing business as Thames Jackson Harris Co. Realty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Erwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William N. Lucy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?