Dog River Marina et al v. Lampland et al
Plaintiff: Boat Works, Inc and Dog River Marina
Defendant: M/V Tunnel Vision, Jay Lampland and Big Wave LLC
Not Classified By Court: Dog River Marina and Boat Works, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00529
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of USM 285 served 11/13/2020 as to M/V Tunnel Vision (meh).
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TFM-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (clr)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 Summonses Issued as to Big Wave LLC, and Jay Lampland. (Note to Counsel: The Summonses have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 Admiralty Warrant Issued to U S Marshal as to M/V Tunnel Vision. (mab) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2020: #1 USM Receipt) (mab).
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Appointing Substitute Custodian, GRANTING #3 Motion to Appoint Substitute Custodian, and APPOINTING Dog River Marina and Boat Works, Inc. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 11/6/2020. (cert copy to USM) (mab)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for issuance of a Warrant of Arrest of the M/V TUNNEL VISION, and directing clerk to issued warrant of arrest. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 11/6/2020. (cert copy to USM) (mab)
November 6, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Order of Arrest and #3 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian; Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian by Boat Works, Inc, Dog River Marina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Crutchfield, Blane)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Order of Arrest by Boat Works, Inc, Dog River Marina. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Warrant for Arrest of Vessel) (Crutchfield, Blane)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Big Wave LLC, Jay Lampland, M/V Tunnel Vision ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2705085, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Dog River Marina, Boat Works, Inc. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 2/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Big Wave, #3 Summons - Lampland) (Crutchfield, Blane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dog River Marina et al v. Lampland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boat Works, Inc
Represented By: Blane H. Crutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dog River Marina
Represented By: Blane H. Crutchfield
Represented By: Douglas W. Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Tunnel Vision
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Lampland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Wave LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Dog River Marina and Boat Works, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?