Huihui v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: WILLIAM HUIHUI and William Dirk Huihui
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00530
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Owen Todd on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Todd, Victoria)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 11/30/2020 as to Social Security Administration. (srd)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 11/24/2020 as to Attorney General. (srd)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11/19/2020. (srd)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul(SSA), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (srd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2020: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (srd).
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William Dirk Huihui, and #4 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William Dirk Huihui. Clerk is DIRECTED to serve summons and complaint on the Defendant as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11/19/2020. (srd) Copies to parties.
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William Dirk Huihui. (Blakeney, Walter)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (srd)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William Dirk Huihui. Plaintiff is ORDERED to amend his motion for IFP on or before 12/10/2020 as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11/10/2020. (srd)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (srd)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by WILLIAM HUIHUI. (Blakeney, Walter)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( IFP.), filed by WILLIAM HUIHUI. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 2/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Commissioner, #3 Summons General Counsel, #4 Summons US Attorney General, #5 Summons US Attorney) (Blakeney, Walter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huihui v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM HUIHUI
Represented By: Walter Allen Blakeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dirk Huihui
Represented By: Walter Allen Blakeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Victoria Owen Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?