Cross Rip Ocean Engineering, LLC v. Anglo Alexandria Shipping Limited, as owner of the M/V ANGLO ALEXANDRIA
Plaintiff: Cross Rip Ocean Engineering, LLC
Defendant: Anglo Alexandria Shipping Limited
Not Classified By Court: U.S. Maritime Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00549
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Filing 15 Clerk's Notice of Closing without prejudice (per Doc. 14) pursuant to Matthews v. Gaither, 902 F. 2d 877, 880 (11th Cir. 1990). No order will be entered. (srd)
December 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Cross Rip Ocean Engineering, LLC Notice of Dismissal (Betbeze, Jaime)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Release of Vessel as further set out. Letter of Undertaking attached. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/20/20. (jlr)
November 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Thomas Beckmann on behalf of Anglo Alexandria Shipping Limited (Beckmann, Paul)
November 20, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Writ of Attachment Unopposed Motion for Release of Vessel by Cross Rip Ocean Engineering, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Letter of Undertaking, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Releasing Vessel and Transferring Attachment) (Rue, Thomas)
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 WRIT of Attachment issued by Clerk and delivered to USMS with accompanying documents. (jlr)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Issuance of Writ of Maritime Attachment. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/18/2020. (jlr)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appoint Custodian and appointing U.S. Maritime Services, LLC as substitute custodian as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/18/2020. (jlr)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Writ and directing Clerk to issue Writ of Attachment as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/18/2020. (jlr)
November 17, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian , #3 MOTION for Issuance of Arrest Warrant , #2 MOTION for Writ of Attachment to Judge DuBose. (srd)
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas S. Rue on behalf of Cross Rip Ocean Engineering, LLC (Rue, Thomas)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Cross Rip Ocean Engineering, LLC. (Betbeze, Jaime)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian by Cross Rip Ocean Engineering, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Substitute Custodian, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Appointing Substitute Custodian) (Betbeze, Jaime)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Arrest Warrant by Cross Rip Ocean Engineering, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Writ) (Betbeze, Jaime).
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Writ of Attachment by Cross Rip Ocean Engineering, LLC. (Betbeze, Jaime)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anglo Alexandria Shipping Limited, as owner of the M/V ANGLO ALEXANDRIA ( Receipt number AALSDC-2709718, Fee Paid at Intake), filed by Cross Rip Ocean Engineering, LLC. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 2/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (Betbeze, Jaime)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cross Rip Ocean Engineering, LLC v. Anglo Alexandria Shipping Limited, as owner of the M/V ANGLO ALEXANDRIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anglo Alexandria Shipping Limited
Represented By: Paul Thomas Beckmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cross Rip Ocean Engineering, LLC
Represented By: Jaime W. Betbeze
Represented By: Thomas S. Rue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: U.S. Maritime Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?