Hancock Whitney Bank v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Hancock Whitney Bank
Defendant: Eric W. Kludt and Julia Rhea Graves Thomas
Case Number: 1:2020cv00551
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 8 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Disclosure Statement #6 . A review of the disclosure statement has been completed. That review has not revealed any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (gcp)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by Hancock Whitney Bank (Milling, Bert)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Hancock Whitney Bank. (Mahoney, Philip)
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hancock Whitney Bank. Eric W. Kludt served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021 (Mahoney, Philip)
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Julia Thomas by Hancock Whitney Bank served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. (Mahoney, Philip)
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Eric W. Kludt, Julia Rhea Graves Thomas. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Hancock Whitney Bank (Mahoney, Philip)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eric W. Kludt, Julia Rhea Graves Thomas (Filing Fee $400, Receipt number AALSDC-2711242), filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Mahoney, Philip) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (srd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hancock Whitney Bank v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hancock Whitney Bank
Represented By: Philip Daniel Mahoney
Represented By: Jeffery J. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric W. Kludt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Rhea Graves Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?