Dodson v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Terri P. Dodson and Terri Kelly
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00574
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER, The parties' Joint Stipulation to Arbitration and Stay of Proceedings Stipulation #17 is NOTED. This matter is STAYED pending the outcome of arbitration. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or, In The Alternative, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings #4 is DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk is DIRECTED to place this matter on the administratively closed docket. The parties are to file a joint notice within 7 days of the completion of arbitration. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 2/5/2021. (jil)
February 5, 2021 Filing 19 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion to Remand #18 filed by Terri P. Dodson. The motion hearing scheduled on 2/08/2021 is hereby canceled. (jil)
February 5, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE by Terri P. Dodson of Withdrawal of Motion to Remand (Riemer, Kenneth)
February 5, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION Parties' Joint Stipulation to Arbitration and Stay of Proceedings by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Turner, Sara)
February 5, 2021 REFERRAL OF #17 Stipulation, #18 Notice (Other) to Judge Beaverstock. (mbp)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Motion to Continue. Motion Hearing is reset for 2/08/2021 01:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. If any party would like to attend by video conference, directions for the video conference will be forthcoming by e-mail. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 01/25/2021. (jil)
January 25, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing filed by Terri P. Dodson. (Riemer, Kenneth)
January 25, 2021 Reset Hearing (per doc. 16): Motion Hearing re: #6 Motion to Remand reset for 2/8/2021 01:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. (cmj)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION to Remand. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2021 03:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. If any party would like to attend by video conference, directions for the video conference will be forthcoming by e-mail. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 1/21/21. (Doc. 13 requesting attendance via video conference is granted per this order) (cmj)
January 21, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION To Appear for the January 25, 2021 Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand via Telephone or Videoconference filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Turner, Sara)
January 13, 2021 REFERRAL OF #12 Reply to Response to Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
January 11, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion #6 to Remand filed by Terri P. Dodson. (Riemer, Kenneth)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum in Support. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2021 03:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 1/5/20. (cmj)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 01/05/2021. (jil)
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re: #6 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum in Support filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Turner, Sara)
January 4, 2021 REFERRAL OF #9 Response to Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to Remand filed by Terri P. Dodson. (Riemer, Kenneth)
December 28, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to Remand to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #6 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum in Support filed by Terri P. Dodson Responses due by 1/4/2021; Replies due by 1/11/2021; Motion to be taken under submission on 1/12/2021. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 12/21/20. (cmj)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum in Support filed by Terri P. Dodson. (Riemer, Kenneth)
December 21, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum in Support to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, In The Alternative, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. Responses due by 12/22/2020 Replies due by 12/29/2020. Motion to be taken under submission on 12/30/2020. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 12/8/20. (cmj)
December 8, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or, In The Alternative, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or, In The Alternative, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Turner, Sara)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership. Inc., Wyndham Destinations, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wyndham Vacation Ownership. Inc., Other Affiliate Wyndham Destinations, Inc. for Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc... (Turner, Sara)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2715985, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket and Filings, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Turner, Sara)
November 30, 2020 Answer due from Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. within time set out in FRCP 12(a). (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodson v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri P. Dodson
Represented By: Kenneth J. Riemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Kelly
Represented By: Kenneth J. Riemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?