Bru v. Loenbro Instrumentation & Electrical, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Bru
Defendant: Loenbro Instrumentation & Electrical, LLC and David Cerutti
Case Number: 1:2020cv00578
Filed: December 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: P Bradley Murray
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by David Cerutti of Acceptance of Service (Gaillard, Thomas)
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas O. Gaillard, III on behalf of David Cerutti, Loenbro Instrumentation & Electrical, LLC (Gaillard, Thomas)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 Alias Summons Issued as to David Cerutti. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Joseph Bru Alias (Rosenthal, Ian)
December 16, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Loenbro Instrumentation & Electrical, LLC. Loenbro Instrumentation & Electrical, LLC waiver sent on 12/2/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (Gaillard, Thomas)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Leonbro Instrumentation & Electrical, LLC on 12/02/2020 by Joseph Bru. (Rosenthal, Ian)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Service Order entered 12/3/2020. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 1/18/2021.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 12/3/20. (cmj)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to David Cerutti. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Cerutti, Loenbro Instrumentation & Electrical, LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2717959, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Joseph Bru. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 3/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Defendant Cerutti) (Rosenthal, Ian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bru v. Loenbro Instrumentation & Electrical, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bru
Represented By: Ian David Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loenbro Instrumentation & Electrical, LLC
Represented By: Thomas O. Gaillard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cerutti
Represented By: Thomas O. Gaillard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?