Lima et al v. Ranger Environmental Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Rafael Lima and Javier Grace
Defendant: Ranger Environmental Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00598
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION and APPLICATION for Mary Bubbett Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2757417, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification, #2 Exhibit Application, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Jackson, Jody) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/11/2021) (mab).
February 11, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION and APPLICATION for Mary Bubbett Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D.; Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Order granting parties' #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. The Deadline for Defendant to file an Answer is extended to February 17, 2021. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 2/8/2021. (mab)
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Ranger Environmental Services, LLC. (Dukes, Carter)
February 2, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
January 25, 2021 Answer due from Ranger Environmental Services, LLC, pursuant to FRCP 12(a). (tot)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Tonya Portie, Registered Agent for Ranger Environmental Services, LLC on 1/13/2021, filed by Javier Grace, Rafael Lima. (Jackson, Jody)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ranger Environmental Services, LLC. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ranger Environmental Services, LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2726250, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Proposed Summons) (Jackson, Jody)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lima et al v. Ranger Environmental Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Lima
Represented By: Jody Forester Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Grace
Represented By: Jody Forester Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranger Environmental Services, LLC
Represented By: William Edward Stevenson
Represented By: Carter H. Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?