F Family South, LLC v. Baldwin County, Alabama
Plaintiff: F Family South, LLC
Defendant: Baldwin County, Alabama
Case Number: 1:2020cv00612
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by F Family South, LLC. Baldwin County, Alabama served on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021 (Benton, Thomas)
February 8, 2021 Filing 13 Alias Summons Issued as to Baldwin County, Alabama. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
February 8, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Alias Summons by F Family South, LLC as to Baldwin County, Alabama (Benton, Thomas) Modified on 2/8/2021 (cmj).
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying request for entry of default, construed as a motion for such relief and because default has not been entered, doc. #10 Motion for Default Judgment is likewise denied as set out. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 2/3/21. (cmj)
February 3, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Default Judgment to Judge Steele (cmj)
February 2, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by F Family South, LLC. (Benton, Thomas)
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by F Family South, LLC. Baldwin County, Alabama served on 1/7/2021, answer due 1/28/2021 (Benton, Thomas)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #6 Disclosure Statement filed by F Family South, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/6/2021. (ctn)
January 6, 2021 Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by F Family South, LLC. (Steele, William)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff F Family South, LLC. (Benton, Thomas)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Service Order entered 1/4/2021. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 2/15/2021.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 1/4/21. (cmj)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Baldwin County, Alabama. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: F Family South, LLC is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (required of "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Wed. 1/6/2021 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/31/2020. (ctn)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by F Family South, LLC (Benton, Thomas)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baldwin County, Alabama ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2731750, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by F Family South, LLC. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 3/30/2021. (Benton, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: F Family South, LLC v. Baldwin County, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baldwin County, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F Family South, LLC
Represented By: Thomas H. Benton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?