McConnell v. Saul
Plaintiff: Colton McConnell
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2021cv00012
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served 01/19/2021 as to U. S. Attorney General. (srd)
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served 01/19/2021 as to Social Security Administration. (srd)
January 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Attorney's Office served on 1/13/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (srd)
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth P. Stepan on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Stepan, Elizabeth)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 01/08/2021. (srd)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (srd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2021: #1 Cert Mail Receipts) (srd).
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/7/2021. (bld)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Colton McConnell. (Coplin, William)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( IFP.), filed by Colton McConnell. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 4/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Coplin, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2021: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (srd).
January 6, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (srd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McConnell v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colton McConnell
Represented By: William T. Coplin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Elizabeth P. Stepan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?