Hancock Whitney Bank v. Norris
Plaintiff: Hancock Whitney Bank
Defendant: Kenneth L Norris doing business as Norris Imaging
Case Number: 1:2021cv00015
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hancock Whitney Bank. Kenneth L Norris served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Mahoney, Philip)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Motion for Service by Publication. Plaintiff is directed to continue its service efforts, as set out, and if efforts remain fruitless, to file a notice of service attempt on or before 2/22/21. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 2/1/21. (cmj)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Service by Publication to Judge Steele (cmj)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Mahoney, Philip)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Service Order entered 1/7/2021. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 2/22/2021.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 1/7/21. (cmj)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kenneth L Norris. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Hancock Whitney Bank (Mahoney, Philip) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/7/2021) (cmj).
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenneth L Norris ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2734948, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Hancock Whitney Bank. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 4/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Mahoney, Philip) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2021: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hancock Whitney Bank v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L Norris doing business as Norris Imaging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hancock Whitney Bank
Represented By: Philip Daniel Mahoney
Represented By: Jeffery J. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?