United States of America v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Theresa K. Thomas and Kevin N. Thomas
Case Number: 1:2021cv00040
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/22/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 3/9/21. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag) (copy mailed to defendants) (cmj)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kevin N. Thomas, Theresa K. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (srd)
February 5, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Theresa K. Thomas waiver sent on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Young, Forrest)
February 5, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Kevin N. Thomas waiver sent on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Young, Forrest)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Service Order entered 1/28/2021. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 3/12/2021.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 1/28/21. (cmj)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kevin N. Thomas, Theresa K. Thomas. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kevin N. Thomas, Theresa K. Thomas, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 4/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons for Kevin Thomas, #2 Proposed Summons for Theresa Thomas, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Young, Forrest)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa K. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin N. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Forrest Young
Represented By: Forrest T. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?