Troxel v. Gunite Pros, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Troxel
Defendant: Carla Castillion, Gunite Pros, LLC and Paul Castillion
Case Number: 1:2021cv00057
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Gunite Pros, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/2/2021. (ajl)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER: The provisions of Rule 26(a)(1) are WAIVED. All discovery in this case is STAYED, except as provided in this Order. Court Interrogatories due by 4/23/2021. Verified Summary due by 5/14/2021. Position Regarding Settlement due by 6/25/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/2/21. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag) (cmj)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #8 filed by Gunite Pros, LLC. (Steele, William)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Gunite Pros, LLC. (Thompson, Joshua)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Carla Castillion, Gunite Pros, LLC, Paul Castillion. (Dukes, Carter)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Troxel. Paul Castillion served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021 (Lowery, Courtney)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Troxel. Carla Castillion served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021 (Lowery, Courtney)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Troxel. Gunite Pros, LLC served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021 (Lowery, Courtney)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Service Order entered 2/4/2021. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 3/22/2021.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 2/4/21. (cmj)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Carla Castillion, Gunite Pros, LLC, Paul Castillion. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carla Castillion, Gunite Pros, LLC, Paul Castillion ( Filing fee $402 receipt number CALSDC-2752117, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Michael Troxel. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 5/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Consent to Join -- Michael Troxel, #3 Exhibit Summons - Gunite Pros, LLC, #4 Exhibit Summons - Paul Castillion, #5 Exhibit Summons - Carla Castillion) (Lowery, Courtney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Troxel v. Gunite Pros, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Castillion
Represented By: Carter H. Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gunite Pros, LLC
Represented By: Carter H. Dukes
Represented By: Joshua Stephen Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Castillion
Represented By: Carter H. Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Troxel
Represented By: Courtney Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?