Redbrick Ventures LTD et al v. CAC Maritime LTD
Plaintiff: Redbrick Ventures LTD and Primeshipping International
Defendant: CAC Maritime LTD
Garnishee: PNC Bank, N.A.
Claimant: Stiegler Shipping Co. Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00083
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 22 Clerk's Notice of Dismissal without prejudice (per Doc. 21) pursuant to 41(a)(1)(A)(i). No order will be entered. See Matthews v. Gaither, 902 F. 2d 877, 880 (11th Cir. 1990). (srd)
March 31, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Redbrick Ventures LTD, Primeshipping International (Potts, Charles)
March 31, 2021 REFERRAL OF #21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal to Judge DuBose. (srd)
March 30, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment and Interrogatories by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Parker, George)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: It is ORDERED that #10 Motion to Vacate is WITHDRAWN per #16 Notice. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/24/21. (gcp)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: It is ORDERED that per #16 and #17 , the March 25, 2021 hearing is CANCELLED and the Motion to Vacate #10 is deemed WITHDRAWN. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file, on or before April 1, 2021 a Status Report regarding the Rule B Attachment. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/24/21. (gcp)
March 24, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Primeshipping International, Redbrick Ventures LTD re #10 MOTION to Vacate #6 Order on Motion for Writ of Attachment,, Order on Motion to Appoint Process Server, #7 Order Request for Expedited Hearing Pursuant to Supplemental Rule E(4)(f) to Vacate Attachment of PNC Bank Accounts and Request for Cancellation of Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - correspondence to PNC Bank) (Potts, Charles)
March 24, 2021 DOCUMENT REFERRED: #16 Notice of Release of Garnishment and Withdrawal of Motion to Vacate Request to Cancel Hearing Set (srd) Referred to Judge DuBose.
March 24, 2021 REFERRAL OF #17 Notice (Other) to Judge DuBose. (srd)
March 23, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by Stiegler Shipping Co. Inc. re #13 Order,,, Set Hearings,, #7 Order, #10 MOTION to Vacate #6 Order on Motion for Writ of Attachment,, Order on Motion to Appoint Process Server, #7 Order Request for Expedited Hearing Pursuant to Supplemental Rule E(4)(f) to Vacate Attachment of PNC Bank Accounts - Withdrawal of Motion to Vacate [ECF 10] on Plaintiffs' Withdrawal/ Cancelation of Writ of Maritime Garnishment to PNC and Release of Accounts from Garnishment; Request for the Court to Cancel Expedited Hearing ( March 25, 2020, ECF 7) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Counsel Letter to PNC Bank Withdrawing Garnishment Writ) (Simms, John) d).
March 21, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Stiegler Shipping Co. Inc.. (Simms, John)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting [11, 12] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as supplemented. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 3/18/2021. (Milling, Bert)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order re: #10 MOTION to Vacate #6 Order on Motion for Writ of Attachment, Order on Motion to Appoint Process Server, #7 Order Request for Expedited Hearing Pursuant to Supplemental Rule E(4)(f) to Vacate Attachment of PNC Bank Accounts filed by Stiegler Shipping Co. Inc. Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/25/2021 at 9:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 03/18/2021. (srd)
March 18, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Stiegler Shipping Co. Inc. re #11 MOTION and APPLICATION for J. Stephen Simms to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. - Certificate of Good Standing Issued by U.S. District Court, District of Maryland, for J. Stephen Simms (Simms, John)
March 18, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Vacate #6 Order on Motion for Writ of Attachment,, Order on Motion to Appoint Process Server, #7 Order Request for Expedited Hearing Pursuant to Supplemental Rule E(4)(f) to Vacate Attachment of PNC Bank Accounts to Judge DuBose. (srd)
March 18, 2021 REFERRAL OF #12 Notice (Other) to Judge Milling. (srd)
March 18, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION and APPLICATION for J. Stephen Simms to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (srd)
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION and APPLICATION for J. Stephen Simms to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2777508, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Stiegler Shipping Co. Inc.. (Simms, John)
March 17, 2021 Filing 10 WITHDRAWN - MOTION to Vacate #6 Order on Motion for Writ of Attachment,, Order on Motion to Appoint Process Server, #7 Order Request for Expedited Hearing Pursuant to Supplemental Rule E(4)(f) to Vacate Attachment of PNC Bank Accounts filed by Stiegler Shipping Co. Inc.. (Simms, John) Modified on 3/24/2021 (srd).
March 1, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to CAC Maritime LTD. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Primeshipping International, Redbrick Ventures LTD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed summons) (Potts, Charles)
February 27, 2021 Filing 7 Writ of Maritime Attachment as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/27/2021. (jlr)
February 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Doc. #3 Motion for Writ as set out; and granting Doc. #5 Motion to Appoint Process Server. The Clerk is directed to issue the Writ of Attachment. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/27/21. (jlr)
February 23, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Appoint Process Server , #3 MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Garnishment to Judge DuBose. (srd)
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Process Server filed by Primeshipping International, Redbrick Ventures LTD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Special Process Server) (Potts, Charles)
February 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Redbrick Ventures LTD, Primeshipping International re: #3 MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Garnishment (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment) (Potts, Charles)
February 22, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Garnishment filed by Primeshipping International, Redbrick Ventures LTD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Authorizing Issuance of Attachment) (Potts, Charles)
February 22, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Primeshipping International, Redbrick Ventures LTD. (Potts, Charles)
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAC Maritime LTD ( Receipt number AALSDC-2762137, fee $402.00), filed by Redbrick Ventures LTD, Primeshipping International. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 5/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - copy of the fixture recap and charter party, #2 Exhibit 2 - copy of the most recent statement of account, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of attorney Charles J. Potts) (Potts, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redbrick Ventures LTD et al v. CAC Maritime LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redbrick Ventures LTD
Represented By: Charles J. Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Primeshipping International
Represented By: Charles J. Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAC Maritime LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: George Robert Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Stiegler Shipping Co. Inc.
Represented By: John Stephen Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?