Thomas v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Wayne Thomas
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2021cv00087
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, GRANTING #13 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brandee J. Kowalzyk. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/1/2021. (mab)
April 1, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION and APPLICATION for Brandee J. Kowalzyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2784866, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Kowalzyk, Brandee)
April 1, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 MOTION and APPLICATION for Brandee J. Kowalzyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. A; Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's #11 Motion for Leave to Withdraw Richard B. North, Jr. as Counsel. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 3/31/2021. (mab)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, GRANTING #12 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Taylor T. Daly. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 3/31/2021. (mab)
March 31, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION and APPLICATION for Taylor T. Daly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2784532, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Daly, Taylor)
March 31, 2021 REFERRAL OF #12 MOTION and APPLICATION for Taylor T. Daly to Appear Pro Hac Vice to Judge Moorer. (tot)
March 9, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Richard B. North, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Maughan, Diane)
March 9, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Richard B. North, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
February 24, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Maughan, Diane)
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by George LaFayette Morris on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Morris, George)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Babb Maughan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane)
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-01221. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 22, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Southern District of Alabama via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 *AMENDED By Doc. #6 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/12/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *VACATED By Doc. #4 *ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 20990 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/13/19. (MAP) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
April 26, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-1221-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
April 26, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12895166 filed by Vincent Wayne Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Brandee J. Kowalzyk
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Represented By: George LaFayette Morris
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Brandee J. Kowalzyk
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Represented By: George LaFayette Morris
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Wayne Thomas
Represented By: Matthew J Riley
Represented By: Justin W Fishback
Represented By: Ethan L Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?