Nevills-Roberson v. Cepeda
Plaintiff: Kameshia Nevills-Roberson
Defendant: Manuel Lawrence Cepeda
Case Number: 1:2021cv00131
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Manuel Lawrence Cepeda. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Kameshia Nevills-Roberson summons cepeda (Mullins, Stephen)
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray for trial. (eec)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Nevills-Roberson vs Cepeda against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2779993, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Kameshia Nevills-Roberson. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 6/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit exhibit A) (Mullins, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nevills-Roberson v. Cepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Lawrence Cepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kameshia Nevills-Roberson
Represented By: Stephen Wright Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?