Funk v. Hawkins et al
Plaintiff: Donald Funk
Defendant: Harry Julian Hawkins, Jr., Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois and The Estate of Harry Julian Hawkins
Case Number: 1:2021cv00135
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (tgw)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order re: #9 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. The stipulation cannot be construed as a notice of dismissal pursuant to Rule 41. It is ORDERED that Safeco remain as a party in this case until properly dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/27/2021. (tgw)
April 26, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Safeco Insurance Company by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Diaz, Caleb)
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Cooper C. Thurber on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Thurber, Cooper)
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Caleb William Diaz on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Diaz, Caleb)
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL Third from Mobile, AL, case number 02-CV-2021-900321., filed by The Estate of Harry Julian Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Caldwell, Leslie)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order directing the Estate to file an amended Notice of Removal by 4/7/2021, as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 3/31/2021. (tgw)
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL Second from Mobile, AL, case number 02-CV-2021-900321., filed by Harry Julian Hawkins, Jr. (Caldwell, Leslie)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (tgw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2021: #1 Request for Reassignment) (tgw).
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL , case number 02-CV-2021-900321., filed by Harry Julian Hawkins, Jr. (Caldwell, Leslie)
March 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-2780343, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Harry Julian Hawkins, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Caldwell, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Funk v. Hawkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Julian Hawkins, Jr.
Represented By: Leslie Ann Caldwell
Represented By: Hunter C. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Cooper C. Thurber
Represented By: Caleb William Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Harry Julian Hawkins
Represented By: Leslie Ann Caldwell
Represented By: Hunter C. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Funk
Represented By: Ryan Joseph Canon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?