In the Matter of Fish Trap Charters, LLC
Plaintiff: Fishtrap Charters, LLC
Defendant: Marina Village Association Owners, LLC
Petitioner: In the Matter of Fish Trap Charters, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00156
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Marina Village Association Owners, LLC is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (required of "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Tues. 6/1/2021 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/24/2021. (ctn)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 05/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (srd)
May 21, 2021 Filing 10 CLAIMS AND ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand AGAINST FISH TRAP CHARTERS, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against In the Matter of Fish Trap Charters, LLC by Marina Village Association Owners, LLC. (Dailey, James)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER APPROVING FISH TRAP CHARTERS, LLC's LETTER OF UNDERTAKING, RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS, DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE, AND SETTING DEADLINE TO ASSERT CLAIMS as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/03/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (srd)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #6 Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Fish Trap Charters, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/8/2021. (ctn)
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by In the Matter of Fish Trap Charters, LLC, Review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to S.D. Ala. Civ. L.R. 7.1 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
April 7, 2021 REFERRAL OF #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement to Judge Nelson. (srd)
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Petitioners In the Matter of Fish Trap Charters, LLC, AL KEAHL, KAREN SKALNEK identifying Other Affiliate AL KEAHL, Other Affiliate KAREN SKALNEK for In the Matter of Fish Trap Charters, LLC.. (Hails, Edward)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order re: #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Fish Trap Charters, LLC. Petitioner shall file NLT an amended disclosure statement NLT 4/13/2021 as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 04/06/2021. (srd)
April 6, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Fishtrap Charters, LLC. (Hails, Edward)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Fishtrap Charters, LLC is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (required of "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Fri. 4/9/2021 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/5/2021. (ctn)
April 5, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION Interim Relief and Entry of a Concursus Order to Judge DuBose (nah)
April 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION Interim Relief and Entry of a Concursus Order filed by Fishtrap Charters, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Notice) (Hails, Edward)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability ( Filing fee $402 Receipt Number AALSDC-2785705, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Fishtrap Charters, LLC. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 6/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Hails, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2021: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of Fish Trap Charters, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fishtrap Charters, LLC
Represented By: Edward Barrett Hails
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marina Village Association Owners, LLC
Represented By: James J. Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In the Matter of Fish Trap Charters, LLC
Represented By: Edward Barrett Hails
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?