Snowden v. Amedisys Home Health of Alabama, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Edrean Snowden
Defendant: Amedisys Hospice, LLC, Amedisys Home Health of Alabama, LLC, Amedisys Holding, LLC, Amedisys Home Health, Inc. of Alabama, Amedisys Alabama, LLC and Amedisys, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00158
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order re: #26 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Edrean Snowden. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 05/28/2021. (srd)
May 28, 2021 REFERRAL OF #26 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Bivins. (srd)
May 26, 2021 Filing 26 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Taylor, Richard)
May 6, 2021 Remark - DVD received of video statement of Ms. Snowden re doc. 18, paragraph 5. (Located in RED FILE FOLDER in Clerk's Office) (cmj)
May 4, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Amedisys, Inc.. (Cate, Rodney)
May 3, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Amedisys Holding, LLC. (Cate, Rodney)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES re: Response to Order #14 , construed as a notice of voluntary dismissal filed by Edrean Snowden. Defendants Amedisys Home Health, Inc. of Alabama; Amedisys Alabama, LLC; and Amedisys Hospice, LLC dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/28/21. (cmj)
April 26, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #14 Response to Order Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss.pdf filed by Amedisys Alabama, LLC, Amedisys Holding, LLC, Amedisys Home Health of Alabama, LLC, Amedisys Home Health, Inc. of Alabama, Amedisys Hospice, LLC. (Cate, Rodney)
April 26, 2021 REFERRAL OF #22 Response, to Judge Steele. (cmj)
April 23, 2021 Filing 21 Notice of Filing Notice of Service of Deposition filed by Edrean Snowden. (Taylor, Richard)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order re: #14 Response to Order filed by Edrean Snowden. The court construes this as a motion for dismissal under Rule 41(a)(2), as set out. The original defendants are ordered to file and serve, on or before 4/27/21, their response to the deemed motion. ( Responses due by 4/27/2021). Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/22/21. (cmj)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting Plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to take deposition #18 . For good cause shown, Plaintiff's counsel is granted leave to proceed with Plaintiff's deposition before the parties' Rule 26(f) planning meeting and entry of a Rule 16 scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 4/22/2021. (Bivins, Sonja)
April 22, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Immediately Depose Plaintiff Edrean Snowden Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (cmj)
April 21, 2021 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Immediately Depose Plaintiff Edrean Snowden filed by Edrean Snowden. (Taylor, Richard)
April 21, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Thomas Beckmann on behalf of All Defendants (Beckmann, Paul)
April 21, 2021 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Edrean Snowden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Secretary of State Amedisys Holding) (Taylor, Richard)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/7/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 4/21/21. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag) (cmj)
April 21, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO ORDER re: #5 Order,, Set Deadlines, by Edrean Snowden filed by Edrean Snowden. (Taylor, Richard)
April 21, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Amedisys Alabama, LLC, Amedisys Home Health of Alabama, LLC, Amedisys Home Health, Inc. of Alabama, Amedisys Hospice, LLC. (Cate, Rodney)
April 21, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Amedisys Holding, LLC. (Cate, Rodney)
April 21, 2021 REFERRAL OF #16 Amended Complaint, #14 Response to Order to Judge Steele. (cmj)
April 12, 2021 Filing 11 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix WS-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (clr)
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edrean Snowden. Amedisys Hospice, LLC served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021 (Taylor, Richard)
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edrean Snowden. Amedisys Home Health of Alabama, LLC served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021 (Taylor, Richard)
April 9, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edrean Snowden. Amedisys Home Health, Inc. of Alabama served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021 (Taylor, Richard)
April 9, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edrean Snowden. Amedisys Holding, LLC served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021 (Taylor, Richard)
April 9, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edrean Snowden. Amedisys Alabama, LLC served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021 (Taylor, Richard)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for plaintiff to file an amended complaint on or before 4/21/21 that adequately alleges citizenship of each defendant, failing which this action will be dismissed for want of subject matter jurisdiction, without prejudice and without further notice. ( Amended Complaint due by 4/21/2021.) Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/7/21. (cmj)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Service Order entered 4/2/2021. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 5/17/2021.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/2/21. (cmj)
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Amedisys Alabama, LLC, Amedisys Holding, LLC, Amedisys Home Health of Alabama, LLC, Amedisys Home Health, Inc. of Alabama, Amedisys Hospice, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Edrean Snowden (Taylor, Richard)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amedisys Alabama, LLC, Amedisys Holding, LLC, Amedisys Home Health of Alabama, LLC, Amedisys Home Health, Inc. of Alabama, Amedisys Hospice, LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2785716, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Edrean Snowden. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 6/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Taylor, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snowden v. Amedisys Home Health of Alabama, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amedisys Hospice, LLC
Represented By: Paul Thomas Beckmann
Represented By: Rodney R. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amedisys Home Health of Alabama, LLC
Represented By: Paul Thomas Beckmann
Represented By: Rodney R. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amedisys Holding, LLC
Represented By: Paul Thomas Beckmann
Represented By: Rodney R. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amedisys Home Health, Inc. of Alabama
Represented By: Paul Thomas Beckmann
Represented By: Rodney R. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amedisys Alabama, LLC
Represented By: Paul Thomas Beckmann
Represented By: Rodney R. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amedisys, Inc.
Represented By: Rodney R. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edrean Snowden
Represented By: Ruth Roberts Lichtenfeld
Represented By: Richard H. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?