Collier v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Emmet Collier and Emmet Earl Collier
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc, Transocean Deepwater Inc, BP America Production Company, Halliburton Energy Service, Inc., Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc and Transocean Holdings LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00161
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
2 Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc, Halliburton Energy Service, Inc., Transocean Deepwater Inc, Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc, filed by Emmet Collier. (Durkee, Charles)
May 11, 2021 Notice of Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Sheeba Ajwani. Pursuant to the Case Management Order entered in 19-cv-5000-KD-MU-C only the pro hac vice fee is being paid. I certify that documentation has been previously filed in 21cv171. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2806098, Online Credit Card Payment.) (Ajwani, Sheeba)
May 5, 2021 Notice of Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Charles David Durkee. Pursuant to the Case Management Order entered in 19-cv-5000-KD-MU-C only the pro hac vice fee is being paid. I certify that documentation has been previously filed in 19cv447. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2803343, Online Credit Card Payment.) (Durkee, Charles)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/4/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C et al. (cjr)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order, # 2 HIPAA Protective Order, # 3 Authorization) (cjr)
April 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan I. Prater, IV on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Prater, Harlan)
April 6, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Enrique Jose Gimenez on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Gimenez, Enrique)
April 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Jackson Sewell on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Sewell, Robert)
April 2, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-13928. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 Joint Omnibus Designation of Record for the B3 Cases. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (lag) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2021.]
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Severing and Transferring cases in the B3 Pleading Bundle to Other Districts pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) as set forth in document; Case transferred to Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/1/2021. (Originally filed in 10md2179, doc. 27018)(lag) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2021.]
September 24, 2020 *** Attorney Nathan Lee Nelson terminated per Order in the MDL #26680 (cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2021.]
July 21, 2020 *** Attorney Charles David Durkee added. Attorney Craig Downs terminated per order in the master MDL, Rec Doc. 26591 (cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2021.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(lag) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2021.]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Filing Requests for Summons and Summons Returns; ORDERED that requests for summons shall be filed in the docket for the member case, as opposed to the master docket. FURTHER ORDERED that summons returns shall not be filed into any docket, master or member, unless filing the summons return becomes necessary (for example, in connection with a motion for default judgment). When it is necessary to file a summons return, the attorney shall avoid filing the summons return as a separate, stand-alone document in the master docket. Instead, the summons return shall be filed as an exhibit to the motion, etc., to which it relates. (Doc #10204 in 10-md-2179). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 05/20/2013. (gec) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2021.]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRETRIAL ORDERS #1, #11, #12 1st Amended, #25, #31, & #41 2nd Amended. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Attachments: #1 PTO #11, #2 PTO #12 1st Amended, #3 PTO #25, #4 PTO #31, #5 PTO #41 2nd Amended) (gec) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2021.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (djg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2021.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7310152) filed by Emmet Collier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Craig Downs added to party Emmet Collier(pty:pla).(Downs, Craig) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collier v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc
Represented By: Harlan I. Prater, IV
Represented By: Robert Jackson Sewell
Represented By: Enrique Jose Gimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transocean Deepwater Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Harlan I. Prater, IV
Represented By: Robert Jackson Sewell
Represented By: Enrique Jose Gimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transocean Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmet Collier
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Craig Thomas Downs
Represented By: Nathan Lee Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmet Earl Collier
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Craig Thomas Downs
Represented By: Nathan Lee Nelson
Represented By: Sheeba Ajwani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?