Koka Charters, LLC
Counter Defendant: Koka Charters, LLC
Counter Claimant: Paradise by You Condominium Owner's Association, Horace Long, Jr., J. Allan Brown and Bayou Breeze Estates Owner's Association
Case Number: 1:2021cv00169
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Marine
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 14 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to all non-appearing claimants for failure to file claims, failure to plead or otherwise defend. (cmj)
May 24, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to non-appearing claimants filed by Koka Charters, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kevin Jackson, #2 Exhibit B - proposed order) (Hails, Edward) Modified on 5/24/2021 (cmj).
May 24, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #6 Counterclaim of Paradise By You Condominium Owners' Asociation, Bama Breeze Estates Owners Association and Allan Brown by Koka Charters, LLC (Hails, Edward) Modified on 5/24/2021 (cmj).
May 24, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #9 Counterclaim of Horace Long, Jr. by Koka Charters, LLC (Hails, Edward) Modified on 5/24/2021 (cmj).
May 24, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to non-appearing claimants to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
May 18, 2021 Filing 10 Proof of Publication filed by Koka Charters, LLC. Last publication date May 7, 2021. (Hails, Edward)
May 12, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Koka Charters, LLC by Horace Long, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Brown, J.)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/28/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 5/12/21. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag) (cmj)
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Plaintiff Koka Charters, LLC reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Koka Charters, LLC by J. Allan Brown, Paradise by You Condominium Owner's Association, Bayou Breeze Estates Owner's Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Brown, J.)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting/approving #2 Koka Charters LLC's Letter of Undertaking, Restraining Porsecution of Claims, Directing Issuance of Notice and Setting Deadline to Assert Claims. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 4/9/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Claimants) (cmj)
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Koka Charters, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
April 6, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by In Re: Koka Charters, LLC. (Hails, Edward)
April 6, 2021 REFERRAL OF #1 Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability, to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
April 6, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION Interim Relief and Entry of a Concursus Order to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION Interim Relief and Entry of a Concursus Order filed by Koka Charters, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B- Proposed Notice) (Hails, Edward)
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability ( Filing fee $402 Receipt Number AALSDC-2786950, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Koka Charters, LLC. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 7/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Hails, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/6/2021: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koka Charters, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Koka Charters, LLC
Represented By: Edward Barrett Hails
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Paradise by You Condominium Owner's Association
Represented By: J. Allan Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Horace Long, Jr.
Represented By: J. Allan Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: J. Allan Brown
Represented By: J. Allan Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Bayou Breeze Estates Owner's Association
Represented By: J. Allan Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?