Juzang v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Demetrius Juzang
Defendant: Lt. Smith, Cpt. Knight and Lt. Fountain
Case Number: 1:2021cv00216
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carlos Demetrius Juzang. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins (PSU). (srd)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order DENYING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carlos Demetrius Juzang. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a new Motion for IFP by 6/14/2021 as set out. Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff the Court's current Motion for IFP form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 05/21/2021. (srd) Copies to Plaintiff.
May 20, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carlos Demetrius Juzang. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins (PSU). (srd)
May 20, 2021 Filing 4 1983 COMPLAINT against Lt. Fountain, Cpt. Knight, Lt. Smith, filed by Carlos Demetrius Juzang. (srd) Referred to Judge Bivins (PSU).
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order re: #1 Complaint and #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carlos Demetrius Juzang. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to re-file his 1983 Complaint and Motion for IFP on the 1983 Court's form NLT 6/7/2021. Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff the Court's Complaint and IFP forms as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 05/07/2021. (srd) Copies to Plaintiff.
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carlos Demetrius Juzang. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins (PSU). (srd)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 1983 COMPLAINT against Lt. Fountain, Cpt. Knight, Lt. Smith, filed by Carlos Demetrius Juzang. (srd) Referred to Judge Bivins (PSU).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juzang v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpt. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Demetrius Juzang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?