Mobile County Water, Sewer and Fire Protection Authority v. Board of Water and Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile et al.
Plaintiff: Mobile County Water, Sewer and Fire Protection Authority
Defendant: U.S. Dept of Agriculture and Board of Water and Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile doing business as Mobile Area Water and Sewer System
Case Number: 1:2021cv00241
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER granting #25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Memorandum in Support #17 MOTION to Dismiss and #19 Affidavit in Support of Motion. Responses due by 7/13/2021; Replies due by 7/20/2021. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 07/01/2021. (jil)
July 1, 2021 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Memorandum in Support, #17 MOTION to Dismiss , #19 Affidavit in Support of Motion filed by Mobile County Water, Sewer and Fire Protection Authority. (Douglas, Danielle)
July 1, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Memorandum in Support and #17 MOTION to Dismiss; ref to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Memorandum in Support, #17 MOTION to Dismiss, #19 Affidavit in Support of Motion . Responses due by 7/1/2021; Replies due by 7/8/2021. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 06/23/2021. (jil)
June 21, 2021 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Memorandum in Support, #17 MOTION to Dismiss , #19 Affidavit in Support of Motion filed by Mobile County Water, Sewer and Fire Protection Authority. (Douglas, Danielle)
June 21, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Memorandum in Support, #17 MOTION to Dismiss , #19 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Motion to Continue. The hearing scheduled for 6/23/21 is canceled. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 06/16/2021. (jil)
June 15, 2021 MOTION to Continue filed by Mobile County Water, Sewer and Fire Protection Authority; ref to Judge Beaverstock. (see image at doc. 21) (cmj)
June 15, 2021 Filing 21 Motion to Continue by Mobile County Water, Sewer and Fire Protection Authority. (Douglas, Danielle) Modified on 6/16/2021 (cmj).
June 15, 2021 REFERRAL OF #21 Stipulation to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Board of Water and Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile. Responses due by 6/17/2021; Replies due by 6/21/2021. The Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Preliminary Injunction to be taken up together June 23, 2021. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 6/10/21. (cmj)
June 10, 2021 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Board of Water and Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile. (Wettermark, Lawrence)
June 10, 2021 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Board of Water and Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to MAWSS's Brief ISO Motion to Dismiss) (Wettermark, Lawrence)
June 10, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Board of Water and Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile. (Wettermark, Lawrence)
June 10, 2021 REFERRAL OF #18 Memorandum in Support, #19 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
June 10, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION to Dismiss to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
May 26, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Elysees Douglas on behalf of Mobile County Water, Sewer and Fire Protection Authority (Douglas, Danielle)
May 25, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mobile County Water, Sewer and Fire Protection Authority. U.S. Dept of Agriculture served on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/11/2021 (Engelhardt, Todd)
May 25, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mobile County Water, Sewer and Fire Protection Authority. Board of Water and Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile served on 5/20/2021, answer due 6/10/2021 (Engelhardt, Todd)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mobile County Water, Sewer and Fire Protection Authority. Hearing set for 6/23/2021 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 05/25/2021. (jil)
May 25, 2021 Set Hearing: Motion Hearing re: (doc. 2) Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 6/23/2021 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. (cmj)
May 25, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Telephone Conference held on 5/25/2021 re: Motion for Preliminary Injunction (doc. 2). Court Reporter Cheryl Powell. (mbp)
May 21, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew John Rutens on behalf of Board of Water and Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile (Rutens, Andrew)
May 21, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence M. Wettermark on behalf of Board of Water and Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile (Wettermark, Lawrence)
May 19, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
May 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Mobile County Water, Sewer and Fire Protection Authority (Engelhardt, Todd)
May 19, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued to U.S. Attorney General Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Aubrey Patrick Dungan on behalf of Mobile County Water, Sewer and Fire Protection Authority (Dungan, Aubrey)
May 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Mobile County Water, Sewer and Fire Protection Authority (Engelhardt, Todd)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Service Order entered 5/19/2021. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 7/2/2021.. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 5/19/21. (cmj)
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Board of Water and Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile, U.S. Dept of Agriculture. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Mobile County Water, Sewer and Fire Protection Authority (Engelhardt, Todd)
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mobile County Water, Sewer and Fire Protection Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Engelhardt, Todd)
May 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mobile County Water, Sewer and Fire Protection Authority, U.S. Dept of Agriculture ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2810326, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Mobile County Water, Sewer and Fire Protection Authority. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 8/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Engelhardt, Todd)
May 18, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobile County Water, Sewer and Fire Protection Authority v. Board of Water and Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Dept of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Water and Sewer Commissioners of the City of Mobile doing business as Mobile Area Water and Sewer System
Represented By: Lawrence M. Wettermark
Represented By: Andrew John Rutens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mobile County Water, Sewer and Fire Protection Authority
Represented By: Todd David Engelhardt
Represented By: Aubrey Patrick Dungan
Represented By: Danielle Elysees Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?