Shark Tech LLC v. Gagnon et al
Plaintiff: Shark Tech d/b/a Metal Shark Alabama and Shark Tech LLC doing business as Metal Shark Alabama
Defendant: Dean Gagnon
Not Classified By Court: Nicole Gagnon
Case Number: 1:2021cv00279
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed A. Clay Rankin III, Counsel by Shark Tech LLC. All Defendants (Rankin, A.)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 Service Notice issued 7/2/2021. Plaintiff's notice of service attempts due by 8/2/2021 pursuant to Civil L.R. 4(a)(3). (mab)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dean Gagnon, Nicole Gagnon. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons by Shark Tech LLC as to Nicole Gagnon. (Rankin, A.) Modified on 6/23/2021 (tot).
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons by Shark Tech LLC as to Dean Gagnon. (Rankin, A.) Modified on 6/23/2021 (tot).
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shark Tech d/b/a Metal Shark Alabama ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2824967, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Shark Tech d/b/a Metal Shark Alabama. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 9/16/2021. (Rankin, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shark Tech LLC v. Gagnon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Gagnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shark Tech d/b/a Metal Shark Alabama
Represented By: A. Clay Rankin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shark Tech LLC doing business as Metal Shark Alabama
Represented By: A. Clay Rankin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Nicole Gagnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?