Heron Lakes Country Club et al v. Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA
Plaintiff: Heron Lakes Country Club, Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Inc. aso Heron Lakes Holding Company, LLC dba Heron Lakes Country Club and Heron Lakes Holding Company, LLC
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA
Debtor: Yamaha Golf-Car Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00289
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
2 Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set, BYN TELEPHONE, for 9/1/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. (eec)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: This cause is before the Court on the parties' Rule 26(f) Report, filed August 18, 2021. (Doc. 20). This action shall come on for a Rule 16(b) scheduling conference on September 1, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., by telephone, as it is the undersigned's belief that bringing the parties and the Court together at this stage promotes efficiency in the litigation process, helps avoid discovery disputes, provides a clearer path to pretrial resolution, and allows counsel to pose questions to the Court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(1)(B) (providing that a magistrate judge must issue a scheduling order "after consulting with the parties' attorneys... at a scheduling conference."). Counsel shall attend the scheduling conference by telephone by using the following numbers to call-in for the conference call: CALL IN NO.: 877-873-8018 and ACCESS CODE: 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/18/21. (lto)
August 18, 2021 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Strubel, John)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: As previously advised, this action has been assigned to the undersigned Magistrate Judge for all purposes. (Doc. 17). Unless a Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge is sent by email to Edwina_Crawford@alsd.uscourts.gov, prior to August 31, 2021, the undersigned will accept the parties' actions as implied consent and treat this as a consent case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). See Roell v. Withrow, 538 U.S. 580, 590 (2003) ("We think the better rule is to accept implied consent where, as here, the litigant or counsel was made aware of the need for consent and the right to refuse it, and still voluntarily appeared to try the case before the Magistrate Judge."); Chambless v. Louisiana-Pacific Corp., 481 F.3d 1345, 1350-51 (11th Cir. 2007) (finding that an extended period "of continual participation in pretrial proceedings justifies the inference of consent from a litigant aware of the need to consent"). If no party requests reassignment, the Court requests that the parties sign and file the Court's form Consent to the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge on or before August 31, 2021. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send to each party a Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge form and a Consent to the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge form. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/17/21. (lto)
August 12, 2021 Filing 18 Documents endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statements #6 filed by Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA, #7 filed by Yamaha Golf-Car Company, Inc., and #13 filed by Heron Lakes Holding Company, LLC, and Heron Lakes Country Club reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
August 11, 2021 Filing 17 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix -MU after the case number on all future pleadings. (clr)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be referred to the United States Magistrate Judge, to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P.73. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/10/2021. (srd)
August 10, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Heron Lakes Country Club, Heron Lakes Holding Company, LLC.. (Milam, Adam)
August 9, 2021 Filing 14 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #13 filed by Heron Lakes Holding Company, LLC, Heron Lakes Country Club (Milling, Bert)
August 6, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Heron Lakes Country Club, Heron Lakes Holding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Milam, Adam)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order reminding Defendant Heron Lakes Holding Company, LLC to provide requisite citizenship information in its forthcoming Disclosure Statement as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 07/12/2021. (srd)
July 12, 2021 Filing 11 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Disclosure Statements #6 and #7 . A review of the disclosure statements has been completed. That review has not revealed any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (gcp)
July 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Matthew Milam on behalf of Heron Lakes Country Club, Heron Lakes Holding Company, LLC (Milam, Adam)
July 7, 2021 Filing 9 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA, Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 filed by Yamaha Golf-Car Company, Inc. (Milling, Bert)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 07/07/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (srd)
July 6, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor Yamaha Golf-Car Company, Inc.. (Strubel, John)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA. (Strubel, John)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Yamaha Golf-Car Company, Inc.. (Strubel, John)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA. (Strubel, John)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Slay Walters on behalf of Yamaha Golf-Car Company, Inc., Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA (Walters, Emily)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick Strubel on behalf of Yamaha Golf-Car Company, Inc., Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA (Strubel, John)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-2830015, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA, Yamaha Golf-Car Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Brown, H.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heron Lakes Country Club et al v. Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Yamaha Golf-Car Company, Inc.
Represented By: H. Lanier Brown, II
Represented By: Emily Slay Walters
Represented By: John Patrick Strubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heron Lakes Country Club
Represented By: Adam Matthew Milam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Inc. aso Heron Lakes Holding Company, LLC dba Heron Lakes Country Club
Represented By: J. Benjamin Staherski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heron Lakes Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: Adam Matthew Milam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA
Represented By: H. Lanier Brown, II
Represented By: Emily Slay Walters
Represented By: John Patrick Strubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?