McQueen v. Saul
Plaintiff: Kenneth D. McQueen
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2021cv00298
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of green car re: SS complaint served 7/19/21 as to SSA (cmj)
July 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Owen Todd on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Todd, Victoria)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney, served on 7/14/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (cmj)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/13/21. (cmj)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul 70200640000081036658, U.S. Attorney 70200640000081036672 and U.S. Attorney General 70200640000081036665. (cmj)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to serve; finding as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/13/21. (cmj)
July 13, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 Amended Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (cmj)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 Amended MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kenneth D. McQueen. (Holland, Laura) Modified on 7/13/2021 (cmj).
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for plaintiff to either pay the $402 filing fee or complete and file an amended IFP motion on the court's form no later than 7/21/21. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 7/21/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/7/21. (cmj)
July 6, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (cmj)
July 3, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kenneth D. McQueen. (Holland, Laura)
July 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( IFP.), filed by Kenneth D. McQueen. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Holland, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McQueen v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth D. McQueen
Represented By: Laura Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Victoria Owen Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?