Coleman v. Headley
Petitioner: Shon Darrell Coleman
Respondent: Joseph H. Headley
Case Number: 1:2021cv00318
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 ***Case Transfer Confirmation. Case received and opened in Alabama Middle District, Case Number 2:21-cv-00563. (cjr)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Shon Darrell Coleman. This action is transferred to the Northern Division of the USDC for the Middle District of Alabama. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 8/24/21. (copy mailed to petitioner) (cmj)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 RESPONSE to #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Shon Darrell Coleman; ref to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Shon Darrell Coleman that this action be transferred to the Northern Division of the USDC for the Middle District of Alabama. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/13/21. (copy mailed to petitioner) (cmj)
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shon Darrell Coleman. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (cmj)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Shon Darrell Coleman; ref to Judge Bivins. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Headley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shon Darrell Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph H. Headley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?