Foreman v. Watkins
Plaintiff: Mack Auther Foreman, Jr.
Defendant: Paul Watkins
Case Number: 1:2021cv00320
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing information regarding case by Mack Auther Foreman, Jr. Referred to MJ Murray (PSU). (meh)
September 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mack Auther Foreman, Jr., from Staton Correctional Facility to Bullock Correctional Facility. (meh)
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mack Auther Foreman, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Docs)Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray (PSU). (meh)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order, DENYING #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed, and GRANTING Plaintiff leave to refile motion on Court's form by 9/13/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/20/2021. (copy to Pltf) (mab)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER striking #5 Pleading (Doc. 5). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/20/2021. (copy to Pltf) (mab)
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Order Postal Service; Post Master, to do a Full Investigation on Mrs. Sage Pamela Credential as License and/or Certification Mail Clerk filed by Mack Auther Foreman, Jr.; Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray(PSU). (mab)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Mack Auther Foreman, Jr.; Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray(PSU). (mab)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order, DENYING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and directing Plaintiff to file motion on Court's form by 8/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 7/26/2021. (copy to Pltf with IFP form motion) (mab)
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mack Auther Foreman, Jr. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray (PSU). (cjr)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 1983 COMPLAINT against Paul Watkins filed by Mack Auther Foreman, Jr. Referred to MJ Murray (PSU). (cjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foreman v. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mack Auther Foreman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?