Lee v. R&L Management
Plaintiff: Lauquasia Lee
Defendant: R&L Management doing business as The Candy Store
Case Number: 1:2021cv00338
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: P Bradley Murray
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by R&L Management. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/8/21. (cmj)
September 7, 2021 Filing 10 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #9 filed by R&L Management. (Steele, William)
September 7, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants R&L Management, Jennifer Ritter, Ritters Critters, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jennifer Ritter, Other Affiliate Ritters Critters, Inc. for R&L Management.. (McClurkin, Anne)
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by R&L Management. (McClurkin, Anne)
August 25, 2021 Answer due from R&L Management on 9/7/2021. (cmj)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 8/24/2021. (Steele, William)
August 23, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Judge Steele (cmj)
August 22, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by All Defendants. (McClurkin, Anne)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lauquasia Lee. R&L Management served on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021 (Poynter, Virginia)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to R&L Management. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Lauquasia Lee (Poynter, Virginia)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Service Order entered 8/2/2021. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 9/13/2021.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 8/2/21. (cmj)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number BALSDC-2846659, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/27/2021. (Poynter, Virginia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. R&L Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauquasia Lee
Represented By: Virginia Broadway Poynter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&L Management doing business as The Candy Store
Represented By: Anne Laurie McClurkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?