Piatti v. Johns et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Piatti
Defendant: Archie Johns d/b/a Deep South Marine Restoration, Deep South Dock, Piling & Marine Restoration, Great American Insurance Solutions, Inc., Great American Insurance Company and Fisk Marine International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00339
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Crutchfield, Blane)
September 24, 2021 REFERRAL OF #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Bivins. (cmj)
September 23, 2021 REFERRAL OF #8 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Bivins. (srd)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss is due by 9/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 09/23/2021. (ktw)
September 22, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss or for More Definite Statement filed by Joseph Piatti. (Earley, Jimmy)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Piatti. (Earley, Jimmy) Modified on 9/23/2021 (srd).
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss or for More Definite Statement filed by Great American Insurance Company. Plaintiff's counsel is DIRECTED to Show Cause by 9/22/2021, why the claims against Defendant should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and failure to obey an order of this Court as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 09/09/2021. (srd)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss or for More Definite Statement filed by Great American Insurance Company. Plaintiff shall file a response to motion by 8/30/2021 and any reply by Defendants shall be filed by 9/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 08/13/2021. (srd)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 08/09/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (srd)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Deep South Dock, Piling & Marine Restoration, Archie Johns. (Crutchfield, Blane)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss or for More Definite Statement filed by Great American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Tucker, Darrell)
August 6, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Dismiss or for More Definite Statement Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (srd)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-2847305, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Great American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service Papers, #2 Exhibit B - Consent to Removal, #3 Exhibit C - LA SOS Information, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tucker, Darrell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piatti v. Johns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Piatti
Represented By: Jimmy Ray Earley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archie Johns d/b/a Deep South Marine Restoration
Represented By: Blane H. Crutchfield
Represented By: Paul Thomas Beckmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deep South Dock, Piling & Marine Restoration
Represented By: Blane H. Crutchfield
Represented By: Paul Thomas Beckmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Darrell C. Tucker, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisk Marine International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?