Carter v. Meese, Inc.
Plaintiff: Duane Ruben Carter
Defendant: Meese, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00348
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2022 01:30 PM in US Courthouse, Judge's Chambers, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge William H. Steele. Jury Selection set for 11/1/2022 08:45 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge William H. Steele. Discovery cutoff 4/29/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 11/12/2021. Motions due by 6/1/2022. Position Regarding Settlement due by 4/29/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/28/21. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order) (cmj) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 28, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 9/28/2021. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (srd)
September 27, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: TIME CHANGED. Scheduling Conference set, BY TELEPHONE, for 9/28/2021 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady.) To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819 (eec)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/21/2021. (eec)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order re: #4 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Meese, Inc., ( Scheduling Conference set, BY TELEPHONE, for 9/28/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady.) To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/21/2021. (eec)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Spann, Catherine)
September 20, 2021 REFERRAL OF #4 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Cassady. (cmj)
August 12, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to First Amended Complaint by Meese, Inc.. (Spann, Catherine)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/20/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/6/21. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag) (cmj)
August 6, 2021 Answer to Amended Complaint due from Meese, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 81(c). (cmj)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-2850601, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Meese, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court File, #2 Exhibit B-Service of Process on Defendant, #3 Exhibit C-Motion to Amend Complaint, #4 Exhibit D-Order granting Motion to Amend Complaint, #5 Exhibit E-Declaration of David Tingue, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Spann, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Meese, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Ruben Carter
Represented By: Desmond V. Tobias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meese, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Niemeyer
Represented By: Catherine Simon Spann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?