Steadham et al v. Occidental Fire & Casualty of North Carolina
Plaintiff: Cory Steadham and Cayley Steadham
Defendant: Occidental Fire & Casualty of North Carolina
Case Number: 1:2021cv00353
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2022 at 11:00 AM in US Courthouse, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge William H. Steele. Jury Selection set for 11/1/2022 at 8:45 AM and for trial during the month of November 2022. Discovery cutoff 7/1/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2021. Motions due by 7/15/2022. Position Regarding Settlement due by 7/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 10/06/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order) (srd) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 5, 2021 REFERRAL OF #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Milling. (mpp)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Nixon, Faith Ann)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/4/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 8/19/21. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag) (cmj)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Occidental Fire & Casualty of North Carolina. (Nixon, Faith Ann)
August 13, 2021 Answer due from Occidental Fire & Casualty of North Carolina pursuant to FRCP 81(c). (cmj)
August 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Compton on behalf of Cayley Steadham, Cory Steadham (Compton, William)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Blanchard on behalf of Occidental Fire & Casualty of North Carolina (Blanchard, Jacqueline)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-2853227, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Occidental Fire & Casualty of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Nixon, Faith Ann) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2021: #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steadham et al v. Occidental Fire & Casualty of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Steadham
Represented By: Patrick Glenn Montgomery
Represented By: William M. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cayley Steadham
Represented By: Patrick Glenn Montgomery
Represented By: William M. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Fire & Casualty of North Carolina
Represented By: Faith Ann Pate Nixon
Represented By: Jacqueline Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?