Brown et al v. Yarings of Texas, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kylie Brown, Braedyn Brown, Kinsley Brown, Heather Stephenson, Paisleigh Stephenson, Misty Ferrington, Karley Ferrington, Jill Robinson, Kennedy Robinson and Shandalyn Sharbono
Defendant: Yarings of Texas, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00355
Filed: August 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Filing 13 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, filed by Yarings of Texas, Inc.. (Benton, Thomas)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/28/2021. (eec)
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Yarings of Texas, Inc.. (Benton, Thomas)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, adjudged and decreed that counselor Jay Christopher Zainey, Jr., as a member in good standing of the Bar of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana, who has complied with the rules of this Court, be and is hereby admitted pro hac vice to serve the interests of justice in the above entitled cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/15/21. (Cassady, William)
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #7 MOTION and APPLICATION for Jay Christopher Zainey, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with # (Zainey, J. Christopher)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER taking under advisement #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Applicant shall supplement the application by providing a certificate of good standing by one of the federal courts of which he is a member. Supplementation shall be completed not later than September 28, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/14/21. (Cassady, William)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION and APPLICATION for Jay Christopher Zainey, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2871733, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Zainey, J. Christopher)
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Misty Ferrington, Braedyn Brown, Heather Stephenson, Paisleigh Stephenson, Kennedy Robinson, Jill Robinson, Kylie Brown, Karley Ferrington, Shandalyn Sharbono, Kinsley Brown. All Defendants (Strickland, Joshua)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Yarings of Texas, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec)
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by All Plaintiffs (Strickland, Joshua)
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
August 12, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Yaring's of Texas, Inc. on 08/13/2021 by Braedyn Brown, Kinsley Brown, Kylie Brown, Karley Ferrington, Misty Ferrington, Jill Robinson, Kennedy Robinson, Shandalyn Sharbono, Heather Stephenson, Paisleigh Stephenson. Waiver of Service due by 9/27/2021. (Strickland, Joshua)
August 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2854691, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 11/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Strickland, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Yarings of Texas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kylie Brown
Represented By: Joshua Strickland
Represented By: J. Christopher C. Zainey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Braedyn Brown
Represented By: Joshua Strickland
Represented By: J. Christopher C. Zainey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinsley Brown
Represented By: Joshua Strickland
Represented By: J. Christopher C. Zainey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Stephenson
Represented By: Joshua Strickland
Represented By: J. Christopher C. Zainey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paisleigh Stephenson
Represented By: Joshua Strickland
Represented By: J. Christopher C. Zainey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Ferrington
Represented By: Joshua Strickland
Represented By: J. Christopher C. Zainey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karley Ferrington
Represented By: Joshua Strickland
Represented By: J. Christopher C. Zainey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Robinson
Represented By: Joshua Strickland
Represented By: J. Christopher C. Zainey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennedy Robinson
Represented By: Joshua Strickland
Represented By: J. Christopher C. Zainey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shandalyn Sharbono
Represented By: Joshua Strickland
Represented By: J. Christopher C. Zainey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarings of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas H. Benton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?