Volovecky et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Johnnie Volovecky and Helen Volovecky
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00364
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 10/15/2021. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (srd)
October 6, 2021 Filing 10 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order re: #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/05/2021. (srd)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #2 Disclosure Statement filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/5/2021. (ctn)
October 5, 2021 REFERRAL OF #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Nelson. (srd)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Luna, Thomas)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Filing Notice of Service of Civil Subpoenas on Non-parties filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Luna, Thomas)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/4/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/19/21. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag) (cmj)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Luna, Thomas)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Luna, Thomas)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Luna, Thomas)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-2858379, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Luna, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Volovecky et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Volovecky
Represented By: Austin Smitherman Prestwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Volovecky
Represented By: Austin Smitherman Prestwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: James B. Newman
Represented By: Thomas Ryan Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?