Albasini v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Robert Albasini
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 1:2021cv00365
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Callie V S Granade
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/21/2021. (Attachment: #1 consent form) (mab)
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Cassady, William)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (twg)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Marchand, Chad)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Marchand, Chad)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Marchand, Chad)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL , filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-2859253, Online Credit Card Payment)(Marchand, Chad) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2021: #1 Exhibits A & B) (mab). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2021: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albasini v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Albasini
Represented By: David J. Maloney
Represented By: T. Randall Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Chad Marchand
Represented By: Keith B. Franklin
Represented By: W. Pemble DeLashmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?