Anderson v. City Of Prichard et al
Plaintiff: Franklin V. Anderson
Defendant: City Of Prichard, City Of Prichard Police Department, Walter Knight, Donna Hobson and Jonathan C. Anthony
Case Number: 1:2021cv00388
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Franklin V. Anderson. (Norris, John)
November 1, 2021 REFERRAL OF #17 Response to Judge Bivins. (mpp)
October 22, 2021 REFERRAL OF #16 Response to Judge Bivins. (mpp)
October 20, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by Franklin V. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Norris, John)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/1/2021 and replies due by 11/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/12/21. (mpp) Copies to counsel
October 12, 2021 MOTION REFERRED: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (mpp)
October 11, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn Combs Diard on behalf of All Defendants (Diard, Jaclyn)
October 8, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by City Of Prichard, City Of Prichard Police Department, Donna Hobson, Walter Knight. (Redditt, Mark)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Setting Motion Deadlines re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by Jonathan C. Anthony. Responses due by 10/20/2021 and Replies due by 10/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/4/21. (mpp) Copies to counsel
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by Jonathan C. Anthony. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Alabama Army National Guard Memorandum) (Redditt, Mark)
September 21, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed City of Prichard by Franklin V. Anderson. City Of Prichard served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021 (Norris, John)
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Chief Walter Knight by Franklin V. Anderson. Walter Knight served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021 (Norris, John)
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed City of Prichard Police Department by Franklin V. Anderson. City Of Prichard Police Department served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021 (Norris, John)
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Donna Hobson by Franklin V. Anderson. Donna Hobson served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021 (Norris, John)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Franklin V. Anderson. Jonathan C. Anthony served on 9/11/2021, answer due 10/4/2021 (Norris, John)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 Request for Reassignment) (mpp) Copy to Pltf
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Service Order entered 9/8/2021. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 10/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 9/8/21. (mpp) Copies to counsel
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jonathan C. Anthony, City Of Prichard, City Of Prichard Police Department, Donna Hobson, Walter Knight. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (mpp)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Franklin V. Anderson (Norris, John)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jonathan C. Anthony, City Of Prichard, City Of Prichard Police Department, Donna Hobson, Walter Knight ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2868793, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Franklin V. Anderson. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 12/7/2021. (Norris, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mpp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. City Of Prichard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin V. Anderson
Represented By: John Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Prichard
Represented By: Mark L. Redditt
Represented By: Jaclyn Combs Diard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Prichard Police Department
Represented By: Mark L. Redditt
Represented By: Jaclyn Combs Diard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Knight
Represented By: Mark L. Redditt
Represented By: Jaclyn Combs Diard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Hobson
Represented By: Mark L. Redditt
Represented By: Jaclyn Combs Diard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan C. Anthony
Represented By: Mark L. Redditt
Represented By: Jaclyn Combs Diard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?