Traylor v. Parker Towing Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Timothy Traylor
Defendant: Parker Towing Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00391
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Traylor. Parker Towing Company, Inc. served on 9/22/2021, answer due 10/13/2021 (Hamock, Brett)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Parker Towing Company, Inc.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Timothy Traylor (Cartee, Jonathan)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Service Order entered 9/13/2021. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 10/25/2021. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 09/13/2021. (srd)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy Traylor ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2869926, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Timothy Traylor. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 12/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Cartee, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Traylor v. Parker Towing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Traylor
Represented By: Brett Austin Hamock, I
Represented By: Jonathan W Cartee
Represented By: Jonathan Cartee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Towing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?