Sparks v. Maynard
Plaintiff: William J. Sparks
Defendant: Curtis Maynard doing business as Maynard Enterprises
Case Number: 1:2021cv00403
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Curtis Maynard d/b/a Maynard Enterprises to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Curtis Maynard d/b/a Maynard Enterprises filed by William J. Sparks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of William J. Sparks, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Timothy A. Heisterhagen) (Heisterhagen, Timothy)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Curtis Maynard. (copy mailed to defendant) (cmj)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against Curtis Maynard . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Timothy A. Heisterhagen) (Heisterhagen, Timothy)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William J. Sparks. Curtis Maynard served on 9/25/2021, answer due 10/18/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service) (Heisterhagen, Timothy)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Service Order entered 9/17/2021. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 11/1/2021.. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 9/17/21. (cmj)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Curtis Maynard. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Curtis Maynard ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2875322, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by William J. Sparks. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 12/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Commercial Lease Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Commercial Lease Addendum, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Curtis Maynard) (Heisterhagen, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sparks v. Maynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Sparks
Represented By: Timothy Alan Heisterhagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Maynard doing business as Maynard Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?